NY S03067 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - PRINT NUMBER 3067A
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - PRINT NUMBER 3067A
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to terminal rental adjustment clauses in motor vehicle leases; provides that any increase in the consideration given pursuant to such clause upon termination of the lease shall be subject to tax, and that any decrease in the consideration given pursuant to such clause upon termination of the lease shall allow the lessor to claim a credit or refund of tax on such amount.
Title
Relates to terminal rental adjustment clauses in motor vehicle leases; provides that any increase in the consideration given pursuant to such clause upon termination of the lease shall be subject to tax, and that any decrease in the consideration given pursuant to such clause upon termination of the lease shall allow the lessor to claim a credit or refund of tax on such amount.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3067A |
2020-01-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2019-03-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A04070 (Same As) 2020-01-29 - print number 4070a