NY S03039 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the removal of an action from a problem solving court; provides that a "problem solving court" shall include, but not be limited to, drug court, domestic violence court, youth court, mental health court and veterans court.
Title
Relates to the removal of an action from a problem solving court; provides that a "problem solving court" shall include, but not be limited to, drug court, domestic violence court, youth court, mental health court and veterans court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-03-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.625 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.918 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A10072 (Same As) 2018-03-14 - referred to codes