NY S03029 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the disaster-related latent damage recovery grant program.
Title
Establishes the disaster-related latent damage recovery grant program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3029B |
2018-01-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2017 |
2017-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3029A |
2017-05-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-04-24 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |