NY S03021 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - referred to libraries and education technology
Pending: Assembly Libraries and Education Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - referred to libraries and education technology
Pending: Assembly Libraries and Education Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enables public libraries to access employment preparation education (EPE) funds to provide adult literacy education; sets aside three million dollars to be awarded through a competitive grant process; provides that half of such appropriation shall be set aside for libraries serving a population of one million or more.
Title
Enables public libraries to access employment preparation education (EPE) funds to provide adult literacy education; sets aside three million dollars to be awarded through a competitive grant process; provides that half of such appropriation shall be set aside for libraries serving a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Assembly | referred to libraries and education technology |
2018-05-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.961 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | referred to libraries and education technology |
2017-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1170 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05811 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - reported referred to ways and means