NY S03021 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the certification by the education department of certified registered nurse anesthetists.
Title
Provides for the certification by the education department of certified registered nurse anesthetists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2015-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00140 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - ordered to third reading rules cal.150