NY S02994 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - signed chap.35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - signed chap.35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to exemptions from vaccinations due to religious beliefs; and repeals certain provisions relating to exemption from vaccination due to religious beliefs.
Title
Relates to exemptions from vaccinations due to religious beliefs; and repeals certain provisions relating to exemption from vaccination due to religious beliefs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Senate | signed chap.35 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1338 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2994A |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-13 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.230 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | rules report cal.230 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-13 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-20 | Senate | print number 2371a |
2019-05-20 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2019-01-22 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2371A |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1338 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2994A |
2019-05-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2019-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02371 (Same As) 2019-06-13 - signed chap.35