NY S02962 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-28 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-28 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a 120-day warning period for violations at congressionally chartered veterans' organization facilities.
Title
Requires a 120-day warning period for violations at congressionally chartered veterans' organization facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2014-04-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-04-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-02-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.85 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2013-04-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2962A |
2013-04-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2013-03-18 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2013-03-11 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2013-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A02493 (Same As) 2014-06-03 - held for consideration in veterans' affairs