NY S02960 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.513
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.513
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adding a "School Bus Safety" awareness component to the pre-licensing driver's education course.
Title
Relates to adding a "School Bus Safety" awareness component to the pre-licensing driver's education course.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.513 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.375 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | substituted for a605a |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2960B |
2019-05-20 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2960A |
2019-05-06 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-06 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-05-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.407 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00605 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.513