NY S02957 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to creating the Mom and Pop Rent Increase Exemption; provides a tax abatement for limiting rent increases on small businesses in a city of one million or more persons.
Title
Relates to creating the Mom and Pop Rent Increase Exemption; provides a tax abatement for limiting rent increases on small businesses in a city of one million or more persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-02-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.439 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-03-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.547 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
Same As/Similar To
A02418 (Same As) 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in real property taxation