NY S02945 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to aging
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to aging
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes reclassification of rent controlled dwelling retroactive to time of decrease in income of members of household of dwelling.
Title
Makes reclassification of rent controlled dwelling retroactive to time of decrease in income of members of household of dwelling.
Sponsors
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.224 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2019-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1182 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2945B |
2019-05-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGING |
2019-05-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2945A |
2019-05-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGING |
2019-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A03780 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to aging