NY S02938 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires posting notice of the department of financial services toll free consumer's hot-line telephone number.
Title
Requires posting notice of the department of financial services toll free consumer's hot-line telephone number.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.179 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1348 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A03389 (Same As) 2018-04-25 - REFERRED TO BANKS