NY S02926 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates South Park Avenue in or near Lackawanna as a state highway.
Title
Designates South Park Avenue in or near Lackawanna as a state highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1206 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2021-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.901 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03661 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to transportation