NY S02915 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a candidate to designate a committee of not less than 3 persons to appoint and remove the treasurer of his or her campaign committee.
Title
Authorizes a candidate to designate a committee of not less than 3 persons to appoint and remove the treasurer of his or her campaign committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2016-03-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-03-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-02-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-02-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.152 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2015-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-04-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.433 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01130 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to election law