NY S02888 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES
Pending: Senate Women's Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES
Pending: Senate Women's Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to informing maternity patients about the risks associated with cesarean section.
Title
Relates to informing maternity patients about the risks associated with cesarean section.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.14 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED |
2019-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.137 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2888A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | amended on third reading 318a |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | recalled from senate |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-01-23 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-01-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-01-17 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.5 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to health |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED |
2019-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A318A |
2019-05-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2888A |
2019-02-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.137 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
Same As/Similar To
A00318 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES