NY S02874 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8627B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8627B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the incorporation of co-operative property/casualty insurance companies and to the keeping of records by such companies.
Title
Relates to the incorporation of co-operative property/casualty insurance companies and to the keeping of records by such companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8627B |
2012-05-16 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2874B |
2012-05-16 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-16 | Senate | returned to senate |
2012-05-16 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-02 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2012-05-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-04-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.566 |
2012-04-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2874A |
2012-04-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-07 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2011-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-04-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-04-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-04-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.232 |
2011-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A08627 (Same As) 2012-07-18 - signed chap.126