NY S02867 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that services to medical assistance recipients suffering from traumatic brain injuries or qualifying for nursing home diversion and transition services shall be provided outside of managed care programs.
Title
Provides that services to medical assistance recipients suffering from traumatic brain injuries or qualifying for nursing home diversion and transition services shall be provided outside of managed care programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] |
Sen. Robert Rolison [R] | Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.319 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a7369 |
2024-03-26 | Assembly | referred to health |
2024-03-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-03-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-02-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.448 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-03-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.384 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07369 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - substituted by s2867