NY S02863 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expands the law to include the preservation of regionally significant projects with respect to agencies drawing on funds for new building projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands the law to include the preservation of regionally significant projects with respect to agencies drawing on funds for new building projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-04-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-04-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.802
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-04-26Assemblyreferred to local governments
2023-04-26SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-04-26SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-04-19SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-04-18Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-04-17Senate1ST REPORT CAL.602
2023-01-25SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback