NY S02860 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a conviction for operation of a motor vehicle, snowmobile, or all terrain vehicle while under the influence of alcohol or drugs shall be deemed a prior conviction for the purpose of imposing penalties for boating while under the influence of alcohol or drugs and a conviction for operating a vessel, snowmobile or all terrain vehicle under the influence to be a prior conviction of operating a motor vehicle while under the influence.
Title
Provides that a conviction for operation of a motor vehicle, snowmobile, or all terrain vehicle while under the influence of alcohol or drugs shall be deemed a prior conviction for the purpose of imposing penalties for boating while under the influence of alcohol or drugs and a conviction for operating a vessel, snowmobile or all terrain vehicle under the influence to be a prior conviction of operating a motor vehicle while under the influence.
Sponsors
Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. John Flanagan [R] | Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] |
Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] | Sen. George Maziarz [R] | Sen. Stephen Saland [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2012-02-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-02-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-02-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.173 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2011-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-04-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-04-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.372 |
2011-04-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2860A |
2011-04-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2011-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07451 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - held for consideration in codes