NY S02848 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-06 - signed chap.247
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-06 - signed chap.247
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to motor vehicle key and key fob replacement contracts if such is lost or stolen.
Title
Relates to motor vehicle key and key fob replacement contracts if such is lost or stolen.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-06 | Senate | signed chap.247 |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.247 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2848A |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-05-15 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-07 | Senate | amended on third reading 7080a |
2019-05-02 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.269 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-04-09 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-04-04 | Senate | referred to insurance |
2019-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7080A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2848A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-04 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-03-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.247 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07080 (Same As) 2019-09-06 - signed chap.247