NY S02823 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the transportation of liquefied natural and petroleum gas.
Title
Relates to the transportation of liquefied natural and petroleum gas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1258 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2013 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |