NY S02736 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.684
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.684
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to eliminating a disincentive for whistleblowers.
Title
Relates to eliminating a disincentive for whistleblowers.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] |
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.684 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1112 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2736 |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-06 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-06 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.66 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | rules report cal.66 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-04 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to labor |
2019-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A375 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1112 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A00375 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.684