NY S02664 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - PRINT NUMBER 2664A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - PRINT NUMBER 2664A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the online revenues and expenditures transparency act to provide for the development of a single, searchable budget database website accessible to the public, at no cost.
Title
Enacts the online revenues and expenditures transparency act to provide for the development of a single, searchable budget database website accessible to the public, at no cost.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2664A |
2016-02-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2015-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09221 (Same As) 2016-02-04 - referred to governmental operations