NY S02631 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the crime of larceny of a controlled substance making it an A-II felony to steal more than 25 dosage units of a schedule II, III, IV, or V controlled substance from a pharmacy.
Title
Establishes the crime of larceny of a controlled substance making it an A-II felony to steal more than 25 dosage units of a schedule II, III, IV, or V controlled substance from a pharmacy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.708 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2017-06-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2631A |
2017-06-13 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2017-06-13 | Senate | returned to senate |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.916 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A01373 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes