NY S02607 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes health care professionals licensed in other jurisdictions and appointed by the World Triathlon Corporation to practice in this state at a triathlon.
Title
Authorizes health care professionals licensed in other jurisdictions and appointed by the World Triathlon Corporation to practice in this state at a triathlon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.126 |
2017-07-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.89 |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a2802 |
2017-02-28 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-02-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-02-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.196 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02802 (Same As) 2017-06-08 - substituted by s2607