NY S02593 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - PRINT NUMBER 2593A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - PRINT NUMBER 2593A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that teachers, principals, and superintendents are no longer required to sign confidentiality agreements.
Title
Provides that teachers, principals, and superintendents are no longer required to sign confidentiality agreements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2593A |
2018-02-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10386 (Same As) 2018-04-18 - referred to education