NY S02581 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - PRINT NUMBER 2581B
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - PRINT NUMBER 2581B
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a tax on direct broadcast satellite services and video streaming services; establishes the community media reinvestment fund; imposes an excise tax on direct broadcast satellite services or video streaming services; provides monies from the community media reinvestment fund shall be distributed to the state general fund, municipalities and infrastructure or services overseen by the ConnectALL office or organizations identified by ConnectALL.
Title
Establishes a tax on direct broadcast satellite services and video streaming services; establishes the community media reinvestment fund; imposes an excise tax on direct broadcast satellite services or video streaming services; provides monies from the community media reinvestment fund shall be distributed to the state general fund, municipalities and infrastructure or services overseen by the ConnectALL office or organizations identified by ConnectALL.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2581B |
2024-04-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2024-01-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2581A |
2024-01-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2023-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05900 (Same As) 2024-04-08 - print number 5900b