NY S02521 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.764
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.764
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to regulation of the billing of facility fees; requires notice prior to billing facility fees not covered by a patient's insurance; defines facility fees as those charged by a hospital, facility or provider designed to compensate for operational costs separate from professional fees.
Title
Relates to regulation of the billing of facility fees; requires notice prior to billing facility fees not covered by a patient's insurance; defines facility fees as those charged by a hospital, facility or provider designed to compensate for operational costs separate from professional fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.764 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.179 |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | substituted for a3470c |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.888 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2521C |
2022-02-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1526 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2521B |
2021-06-02 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2021-01-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2521A |
2021-01-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2021-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A03470 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - substituted by s2521c