NY S02512 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.389
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.389
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits a telephone corporation to publish rate schedules for certain services on its website instead of with the public service commission.
Title
Permits a telephone corporation to publish rate schedules for certain services on its website instead of with the public service commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.389 |
2013-10-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.511 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a5466a |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2013-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-29 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2512B |
2013-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.101 |
2013-02-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2512A |
2013-02-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2013-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05466 (Same As) 2013-06-20 - substituted by s2512b