NY S02501 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a person convicted of "Buster's Law" from owning or possessing a companion animal unless authorized by court order, after appropriate psychiatric or psychological testing.
Title
Prohibits a person convicted of "Buster's Law" from owning or possessing a companion animal unless authorized by court order, after appropriate psychiatric or psychological testing.
Sponsors
Sen. James Tedisco [R] | Sen. Simcha Felder [D] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] |
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. Joseph Robach [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2018-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1537 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2017-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.936 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A06938 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to agriculture