NY S02493 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits certain student organizations which participate in discrimination or intolerance from receiving funding from SUNY, CUNY or community colleges.
Title
Prohibits certain student organizations which participate in discrimination or intolerance from receiving funding from SUNY, CUNY or community colleges.
Sponsors
Sen. Elaine Phillips [R] | Sen. Simcha Felder [D] | Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] |
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2018-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2101 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2493A |
2018-02-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-08 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-03-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.403 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |