NY S02482 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing a task force on safety in school transportation to review and promote such safety.
Title
Relates to establishing a task force on safety in school transportation to review and promote such safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1480 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2482A |
2019-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2019-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01372 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to education