NY S02458 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.511
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.511
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Hancock, county of Delaware, to alienate and convey certain parcels of land used as parklands.
Title
Authorizes the town of Hancock, county of Delaware, to alienate and convey certain parcels of land used as parklands.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 123 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.511 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.641 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a4748a |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2458A |
2019-06-12 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-12 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1240 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A04748 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.511