NY S02442 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - SIGNED CHAP.142
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - SIGNED CHAP.142
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of "sexual orientation" as applicable to the human rights law.
Title
Relates to the definition of "sexual orientation" as applicable to the human rights law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.142 |
2023-06-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.476 |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a7367 |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-03-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.482 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07367 (Same As) 2023-06-01 - substituted by s2442