NY S02440 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination on the basis of a person's height or weight in opportunities of employment, housing, and access to public accommodations.
Title
Prohibits discrimination on the basis of a person's height or weight in opportunities of employment, housing, and access to public accommodations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2024-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-15 | Senate | AMENDED 2440B |
2024-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1036 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1631 |
2023-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2440A |
2023-06-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2023-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07170 (Same As) 2024-05-14 - print number 7170b