NY S02422 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the reporting of sudden, unexpected death in epilepsy; requires that when an autopsy shows a person died as a result of sudden, unexpected death in epilepsy, such cause shall be noted on the death certificate and filed with the North American SUDEP registry.
Title
Relates to the reporting of sudden, unexpected death in epilepsy; requires that when an autopsy shows a person died as a result of sudden, unexpected death in epilepsy, such cause shall be noted on the death certificate and filed with the North American SUDEP registry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2380 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.410 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02380 (Same As) 2017-08-21 - signed chap.175