NY S02411 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5950A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5950A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a credit for purchase, construction or retrofitting of a principal residence to achieve universal visitability pursuant to guidelines developed by the division of code enforcement and administration within the department of state; caps tax credits awarded at 1 million dollars per year for 5 years.
Title
Relates to a credit for purchase, construction or retrofitting of a principal residence to achieve universal visitability pursuant to guidelines developed by the division of code enforcement and administration within the department of state; caps tax credits awarded at 1 million dollars per year for 5 years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5950A |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1061 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-04-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2411A |
2017-04-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05950 (Same As) 2017-10-23 - tabled