NY S02348 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including the illegal conversions of dwelling units in the definition of harassment.
Title
Relates to including the illegal conversions of dwelling units in the definition of harassment.
Sponsors
Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Cordell Cleare [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate Cities 1 Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate Cities 1 Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2023-04-18 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES |
2023-01-31 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CITIES 1 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09233 (Same As) 2024-02-29 - advanced to third reading cal.338