NY S02323 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1399A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the New York state of health to help veterans ascertain their eligibility for health care through the department of veterans affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the New York state of health to help veterans ascertain their eligibility for health care through the department of veterans affairs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-06SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A1399A
2023-06-01SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1460
2023-06-01SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-17SenatePRINT NUMBER 2323A
2023-05-17SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH
2023-01-19SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A01399 (Same As) 2023-12-22 - tabled

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback