NY S02266 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the offense of defrauding the government in the first degree; expands the definition of conspiracy in the fourth degree; relates to expanding the definition of tax fraud acts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the offense of defrauding the government in the first degree; expands the definition of conspiracy in the fourth degree; relates to expanding the definition of tax fraud acts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-20Assemblyreferred to codes
2024-05-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-05-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-05-16SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-05-15Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-05-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1104
2024-03-12SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-04-17Assemblyreferred to codes
2023-04-17SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-04-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-03-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-03-28Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-03-27Senate1ST REPORT CAL.563
2023-01-19SenateREFERRED TO CODES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback