NY S02257 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - PRINT NUMBER 2257A
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - PRINT NUMBER 2257A
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the effectiveness of flexible rating for nonbusiness automobile insurance plans.
Title
Relates to the effectiveness of flexible rating for nonbusiness automobile insurance plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2257A |
2016-01-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2015-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A00454 (Same As) 2016-05-12 - advanced to third reading cal.566