NY S02231 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits an insurer from cancelling, refusing to issue, refusing to renew, or increasing the premium of a policy or to exclude, limit, restrict, or reduce coverage under such policy solely on the basis that one or more claims have been made against any policy during the preceding sixty months for a loss that is the result of a hate crime.
Title
Prohibits an insurer from cancelling, refusing to issue, refusing to renew, or increasing the premium of a policy or to exclude, limit, restrict, or reduce coverage under such policy solely on the basis that one or more claims have been made against any policy during the preceding sixty months for a loss that is the result of a hate crime.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2207 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.168 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A02207 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - signed chap.65