NY S02210 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for financial disclosure by employees of foundations of state operated campuses, including the Research Foundation of the State University of New York.
Title
Provides for financial disclosure by employees of foundations of state operated campuses, including the Research Foundation of the State University of New York.
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Thomas Croci [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.235 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-04-24 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2210A |
2017-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-01-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.101 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03860 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to higher education