NY S02201 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the reinvestment of funds generated by savings due to declines in the state prison census into community-based services for persons suffering from chemical dependence and for the establishment of the chemical dependence reinvestment fund; provides for the establishment of the state interagency council on chemical dependence reinvestment fund utilization and for the composition thereof.
Title
Provides for the reinvestment of funds generated by savings due to declines in the state prison census into community-based services for persons suffering from chemical dependence and for the establishment of the chemical dependence reinvestment fund; provides for the establishment of the state interagency council on chemical dependence reinvestment fund utilization and for the composition thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-03-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2201A |
2012-03-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2011-06-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-02-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2011-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A06236 (Same As) 2012-03-07 - print number 6236a