NY S02161 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the products which may be purchased for public use by including renewable energy resources; increases the cost premium percentage for renewable energy generated in New York.
Title
Expands the products which may be purchased for public use by including renewable energy resources; increases the cost premium percentage for renewable energy generated in New York.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2014-05-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.880 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2013-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A04013 (Same As) 2014-01-15 - enacting clause stricken