NY S02155 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that at least one commissioner of the public service commission have experience in utility consumer advocacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires that at least one commissioner of the public service commission have experience in utility consumer advocacy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03Assemblyreferred to economic development
2019-06-03SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-03SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-29Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.886
2019-01-22SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A00966 (Same As) 2019-01-14 - referred to economic development

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback