NY S02139 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitting state aid provided to municipalities in which a video lottery gaming facility is located to be used for transportation improvements and highway repairs.
Title
Relates to permitting state aid provided to municipalities in which a video lottery gaming facility is located to be used for transportation improvements and highway repairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-04-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.577 |
2012-01-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2139A |
2012-01-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2011-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |