NY S02096 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a retroactive real property tax exemption from the Incorporated Village of Hempstead Community Development Agency for the 2020--2021 school taxes and the 2021 general taxes for the property at 40 Byrd Street.
Title
Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a retroactive real property tax exemption from the Incorporated Village of Hempstead Community Development Agency for the 2020--2021 school taxes and the 2021 general taxes for the property at 40 Byrd Street.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2024-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1189 |
2024-05-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2023-03-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.305 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06006 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to real property taxation