NY S02077 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to protections relating to direct response marketing of life insurance.
Title
Relates to protections relating to direct response marketing of life insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2017-05-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.431 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A08070 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to insurance