NY S02070 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.210
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.210
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the rural suicide prevention council; requires biennial reports on the findings of the council.
Title
Creates the rural suicide prevention council; requires biennial reports on the findings of the council.
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.210 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.361 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a6007 |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2019-03-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.70 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A06007 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.210