NY S02040 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows only citizens to vote at elections.
Title
Allows only citizens to vote at elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2024-01-04 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2023-02-23 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2023-01-20 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2023-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A02860 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - opinion referred to judiciary